|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/12/1961 | Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/12/1933 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13253 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 121 Allocated to Patricroft (10C) |
||
13/04/1935 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2953 | ||
13/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
01/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
22/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
29/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
21/02/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
24/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
28/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
26/03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42953 | ||
20/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
17/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
08/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
03/08/1957 | Allocation | Loaned to Bescot (3A) | ||
17/08/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
16/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
21/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
24/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
16/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aintree (27B) | ||
09/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42953 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
06/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |