|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/04/1964 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/01/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13261 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 129 Allocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
||
13/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
29/10/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2961 | ||
24/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
09/03/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
07/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
21/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
27/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
03/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
02/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) | ||
29/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) | ||
26/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
08/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
30/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
04/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42961 | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
24/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
18/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
24/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
09/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
23/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aintree (8L) | ||
07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
21/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42961 from Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |