|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/07/1968 | Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks | Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. | SLS/196810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/01/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13268 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 136 Allocated to Willesden (1A) |
||
20/04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
13/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
20/09/1935 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2968 | ||
30/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
14/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
21/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
12/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
26/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
10/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
22/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) | ||
21/02/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
18/12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42968 | ||
03/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
10/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) | ||
16/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
12/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42968 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |