Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4492 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20104 Week
» 118749 Month
» 321413 Year
» 3348266 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13276 |
on |
24/01/1934 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2976 |
|
01/08/1934 |
British Railways |
42976 |
|
05/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P5F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
144 |
To Service |
Sat 24/01/1934 to Crewe South (5B) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 20/07/1963 off Nuneaton (2B) |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/01/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13276 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 144 Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
01/08/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2976 |
|
|
31/12/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
25/05/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) |
|
|
01/06/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
03/07/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
25/09/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
12/10/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
22/02/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
05/04/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
30/01/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
28/08/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
14/07/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
13/09/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
25/10/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42976 |
|
|
03/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
17/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42976 from Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|