Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2195 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19998 Week
» 73014 Month
» 192541 Year
» 3219394 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13277 |
on |
23/01/1934 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2977 |
|
12/03/1936 |
British Railways |
42977 |
|
16/10/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/01/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13277 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 145 Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
31/12/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
25/05/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) |
|
|
01/06/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
12/03/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2977 |
|
|
01/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
25/09/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
05/07/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42977 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
18/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42977 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|