Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 388 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6197 Week
» 13381 Month
» 321362 Year
» 1205743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3002 m/e 12/1947
BR 43002 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 4MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1947
Withdrawal Sat 30/12/1967
Scrapping During 04/1968
Service Life 20 yrs , 1 mth

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5B Crewe South 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 04/11/1950
2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/10/1953
5D Stoke w/e 26/03/1966
12D Workington w/e 12/08/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5B Crewe South w/e 03/01/1948
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 31/01/1948
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 21B Bescot 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 09/04/1966
ALLOC 12D Workington 5w/e 12/08/1967
WDN 12D Workington w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1947 To Service To service as LMS Number 3002
Built at Horwich Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 43002    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 43002    

prev prev