Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3736 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17142 Week
» 70158 Month
» 189685 Year
» 3216538 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3004 |
on |
24/01/1948 |
British Railways |
43004 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Thu 24/01/1948 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1967 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/01/1948 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3004 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43004 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43004 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|