Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4249 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17655 Week
» 70671 Month
» 190198 Year
» 3217051 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43040 |
on |
30/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Sat 30/07/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/11/1966 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
ALLOC |
21B |
Bournville |
5w/e |
31/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
6w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
5w/e |
06/10/1962 |
ALLOC |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5w/e |
11/07/1964 |
LOAN |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
10/09/1966 |
LOAN |
91NE |
|
5w/e |
10/09/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/11/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/11/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/07/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43040 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournville (21B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
27/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43040 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|