Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 43086   24/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 4MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 24/11/1950 to New England (35A)
Withdrawal Sat 26/12/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965
Service Life 14 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England (New) 24/11/1950
32G Melton Constable 5w/e 20/07/1957
35A New England 4w/e 19/10/1957
31B March w/e 07/01/1961
31A Cambridge w/e 22/07/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
40A Lincoln w/e 22/09/1962
34E New England w/e 11/01/1964
   Withdrawn 26/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 35A New England 24/11/1950
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 34E New England 9w/e 08/02/1964
WDN   26/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/11/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 43086
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
26/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 43086    

prev prev