Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 43087   29/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 4MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 29/11/1950 to New England (35A)
Withdrawal Sat 26/12/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965
Service Life 14 yrs , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England (New) 29/11/1950
35B Grantham 4w/e 15/11/1952
35A New England 4w/e 13/12/1952
31A Cambridge 5w/e 20/07/1957
31C Kings Lynn w/e 04/07/1959
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 02/04/1960
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 18/05/1963
34E New England w/e 01/02/1964
   Withdrawn 26/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 35A New England 29/11/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 5w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 34E New England 9w/e 08/02/1964
WDN   26/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/11/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 43087
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
01/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
26/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 43087    

prev prev