Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1272 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19075 Week
» 72091 Month
» 191618 Year
» 3218471 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43089 |
on |
08/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
Sun 08/12/1950 to New England (35A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 14/11/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/11/1960 |
G.E. Dieselisation |
Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. |
SLS/196101 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/12/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43089 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
14/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
18/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
14/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43089 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|