Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 214 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 214 Week
» 11785 Month
» 260078 Year
» 1144459 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 43105   30/03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 4MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 30/03/1951 to South Lynn (31D)
Withdrawal Sat 27/05/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967
Service Life 16 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31D South Lynn (New) 30/03/1951
30A Stratford w/e 07/03/1959
31B March w/e 17/06/1961
31A Cambridge w/e 22/07/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
40A Lincoln w/e 22/09/1962
34E New England w/e 11/01/1964
10A Carnforth w/e 10/10/1964
   Withdrawn 27/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   30/03/1951
ALLOC 31D South Lynn m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/03/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 34E New England 9w/e 08/02/1964
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 10A Carnforth w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 17/10/1964
WDN   w/e 27/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/03/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 43105
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to South Lynn (31D)
   
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
27/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 43105    

prev prev