Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 945 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5076 Week
» 15246 Month
» 293042 Year
» 1177423 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 43106   10/04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 4MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 10/04/1951 to South Lynn (31D)
Withdrawal Sat 22/06/1968
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31D South Lynn (New) 10/04/1951
38E Woodford Halse m/e 21/07/1956
21A Saltley w/e 31/03/1962
15A Wellingborough w/e 23/06/1962
15B Kettering w/e 23/03/1963
9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 17/08/1963
9F Heaton Mersey w/e 21/09/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 27/08/1966
10D Lostock Hall w/e 23/09/1967
   Withdrawn 22/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 31D South Lynn 10/04/1951
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 21/07/1956
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse 23/02/1958
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 15B Kettering 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 10/09/1966
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 4w/e 07/10/1967
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 22/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/04/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 43106
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to South Lynn (31D)
   
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
31/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
23/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
17/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
27/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
23/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
22/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 43106    

prev prev