Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1573 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19376 Week
» 72392 Month
» 191919 Year
» 3218772 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43128 |
on |
31/10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Mon 31/10/1951 to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/07/1965 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
52CAlSTON |
|
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
ALLOC |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
4w/e |
18/06/1955 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
21/07/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43128 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
12/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43128 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|