Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 675 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18478 Week
» 71494 Month
» 191021 Year
» 3217874 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43145 |
on |
20/09/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sun 20/09/1951 to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/01/1965 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43145 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
10/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43145 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|