|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1957 | Stratford Works | The latest LMR Class 4 Moguls to be repaired here are 43066 (35A) and 43148/51/2 (32G). | SLS/195709 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/10/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 43148 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
||
07/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
28/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
30/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
11/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43148 | ||
07/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |