Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1037 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18840 Week
» 71856 Month
» 191383 Year
» 3218236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46424 |
on |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 27/11/1948 to Widnes (8D) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/12/1966 |
Service Life |
18 yrs , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/11/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46424 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46424 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|