Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17806 Week
» 70822 Month
» 190349 Year
» 3217202 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46455 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 04/1950 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/05/1967 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/05/1957 |
Penrith |
The 5-0 p.m. two-coach local from Oxenholme arrived behind 42662 of 12A and had a wagon of cattle for Perth attached in rear by 46455 of 12C which appeared to be carrying out shunting duties along with a 'Class 4' 0-6-0 which was occupied in the Yard. The Down Manchester-Glasgow (4-15 p.m. from Manchester Victoria) was headed on (21/5) |
SLS/195707 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46455 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Durran Hill (Carlisle) (12C) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Durran Hill (Carlisle) (12C) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Durran Hill (Carlisle) (12C) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46455 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|