Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 793 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4653 Week
» 7235 Month
» 271868 Year
» 1493433 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 46457 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 05/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/05/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967
Service Life 17 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1950
12D Workington 4w/e 07/10/1950
12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 19/04/1958
21B Bescot w/e 13/01/1962
6A Chester (MR) w/e 18/07/1964
2L Leamington w/e 24/10/1964
2A Tyseley w/e 19/06/1965
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/10/1966
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/12/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 13/05/1950
ALLOC 12D Workington w/e 30/09/1950
LOAN 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 31/12/1955
EXLOAN 12C Workington 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 21B Bescot 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 2L Leamington 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   w/e 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/07/1952 C.K. & P. Section 2-6-0's Nos. 46491 an 46457(12D) were noted at Bassenthwaite Lake station on 2/7: both are 12D. SLS/195208
11/08/1956 West Cumberland Visit SLS members gathered by devious routes in the Citadel station at Carlisle, the writer travelling G. & S.W. from Glasgow 'spotting' ex G.E. 2-4-2T No. 67157 awaiting scrapping at Kilmarnock works with several compound 4-4-0's and K2 2-6-0's. While at Dumfries the last of the McIntosh 19' Class 0-4-4T's (No. 55124) was seen, the London Midland Region striving to cope with large holiday crowds. Matters were not improved by the 'Royal Scot' being halted for a quarter of an hour at platform 3 for its Pacific, 46224, to be replaced by 46252. Our connection, the Perth-London, departed 21½ minutes late at 1-16½ behind 46242 and on arrival at Penrith it was found that temporary alterations had been made in the service on the C.K. & P.-the 1-30 p.m. to Workington followed the through train from Manchester to Keswick. This comprised Class 2MT 2-6-0's Nos. 46456/7, coupled tender to tender, with eight corridors. Traversing Lakeland in brilliant sunshine, after early rain, we descended at tree-shaded Keswick and continued by the retimed 1-30 which was worked by 46491. At Workington (Main), reached at 3-49, a visit was paid to the shed where the centre of attraction was ex-Furness 0-6-0 No. 52499 (with L. & Y. boiler). Another of these locos., 52510, was seen on a freight. The plan to return immediately to Carlisle to do Silloth had now to be abandoned, in any case on Saturdays this branch is taken over from the diesels by J39's and instead we carried on along the coast to Whitehaven by the 4-28 (3.25 ex-Carlisle) which was another steam train-2-6-4T No. 42544 with four packed coaches. At Whitehaven (Bransty) cameras were focussed on un-rebuilt Patriot No. 45542 which came in with a train from the south. Earlier, Stanier 2-6-0 No. 42962 had been seen on one of these, before rejoining the train which now formed the 5-15 to Carlisle. However, some diehards waited for the 6-15 departure and at last ran a diesel set to earth. After traversing the erstwhile Maryport and Carlisle line, the Citadel station was reached 2 minutes late at 6-40 p.m. when a final spot of excitement was provided by our using the same platform as the empty stock of the Royal Train which, that morning, had arrived at Appleby with the Queen and Duke of Edinburgh. It departed northwards in charge of Class SMT 4-6-0's Nos. 44676 an 45455. SLS/195610
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102
03/05/1964 Crewe Works (Outside Diesel Erecting Shop) Awaiting Works at Scrap Yard: 44835, 45064, 48053, 48354, 48717, 70022. Awaiting Scrap at Scrap Yard: 42897, 42922, 48140, 48209. Diesel Erecting Shop: D277, D342, D349, D6843, 26005, 26034, 26048. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D205, D210, D219, D241, D255, D274, D1582 painted, D1583, D1585 undercoat, D1609, D1610, D1611 shell only, 26047, 27006, 46457. Outside Erecting Shop: D254, 42081, 42410, 45080, 45112, 45217, 48528, 92156, 92177. Erecting Shop: D226, D248, D256, D315, D335, D336, D340, D1591 undercoat, D1592 nearly complete, D1593, D1594, D1595, D1596 motors mounted, D1597, D1598, D1599, D1600, D1601, D1602, D1603, D1604, D1605, D1606, D1607, D1608 shell only, D5719, D6789, D6794, D6884, D8050, 42055, 42085, 42394, 44665, 44873, 44884, 45132, 45147, 45182, 45336, 45354, 45415, 45647, 46436, 48211, 48258, 48313, 48424, 48746, 48749, 48759, 92026, 92030, 92085. Works Yard: 42583, 44662, 44872, 44898, 45000, 45271, 45558, 48070, 48171, 48371, 48462, 48538, 48602, 48613, 48684, 70010, 70024, 70049, 78002, 78007, 78017, 92062, 92102, 92126, 92154, 92166, 92227. Outside Paint Shop: D298, D1584 undercoat, D5717, D6775, D6863, D8002, D8027, 48742. Paint Shop: D1578 painted, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 undercoat, 26028. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46457
Built at Crewe Works
   
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
13/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
18/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
15/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
06/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46457    

prev prev