Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 795 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5396 Week
» 16943 Month
» 416625 Year
» 493212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 46464   06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 06/1950
Withdrawal During 09/1966
Service Life 16 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
64A St Margarets 4w/e 23/12/1950
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 17/02/1951
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 14/05/1955
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 24/12/1955
61A Kittybrewster 8w/e 31/08/1957
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 23/11/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 20/06/1950
ALLOC 64A St Margarets m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge m/e 31/01/1951
LOAN 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 14/05/1955
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 24/12/1955
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   17/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 46464
Built at Crewe Works
   
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
24/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
23/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 46464    

prev prev