Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 522 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2429 Week
» 21211 Month
» 269504 Year
» 1153885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 46467 m/e 06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2159
To Service During 06/1951 to Cambridge (31A)
Withdrawal w/e Thu 23/07/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Arnott Young (Troon)
Service Life 13 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31A Cambridge (New) m/e 06/1951
91X To Scottish Region w/e 14/10/1961
67B Hurlford 4w/e 21/10/1961
67F Stranraer 4w/e 16/02/1963
67E Dumfries 5w/e 29/02/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 23/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 31A Cambridge 29/06/1951
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 67F Stranraer 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 67E Dumfries 5w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   w/e 23/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 46467
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2159
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
14/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. SLS 5/1962 Link
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stranraer (67F)    
29/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (67E)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 46467    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev