Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 46468 m/e 07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2160
To Service During 07/1951 to Colchester (30E)
Withdrawal Mon 18/10/1965
Scrapping Tue 01/02/1966
Service Life 14 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30E Colchester (New) m/e 07/1951
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 07/11/1959
30A Stratford w/e 07/01/1961
31A Cambridge w/e 14/01/1961
63C Oban w/e 25/03/1961
63A Perth South 4w/e 03/06/1961
63C Oban 4w/e 01/07/1961
63A Perth South 4w/e 14/07/1962
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn 18/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 30E Colchester 06/07/1951
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 63C Oban 4w/e 08/04/1961
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 08/04/1961
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 03/06/1961
ALLOC 63C Oban 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 63A Perth South 6w/e 18/08/1962
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   18/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 46468
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2160
Allocated to Colchester (30E)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oban (63C)    
03/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oban (63C)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 46468    

prev prev