Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 268 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2175 Week
» 20957 Month
» 269250 Year
» 1153631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 46469 m/e 07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2161
To Service During 07/1951 to Colchester (30E)
Withdrawal During 09/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 11 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30E Colchester (New) m/e 07/1951
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 07/11/1959
30A Stratford w/e 07/01/1961
31A Cambridge w/e 14/01/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 30E Colchester 10/07/1951
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962
WDN   30/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 46469
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2161
Allocated to Colchester (30E)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 46469    

prev prev