Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18097 Week
» 71113 Month
» 190640 Year
» 3217493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46470 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2162 |
To Service |
During 07/1951 to West Auckland (51F) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/05/1967 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/07/1960 |
Barnard Castle-Kirkby Stephen-Penrith and Tebay |
Goods traffic (except for local pick-up Kirkby Stephen-Penrith) ceased after Sat. 2nd July, and the last goods train over the 'top' (i.e. Stainmoor summit) was hauled by 46422 an 46442 which worked from Kirkby Stephen to West Aukland and back. On 21st August only 46449, 46458 an 46470 were left on Kirkby Stephen shed which now has one duty left; in addition a standby engine is needed on Saturdays till the Blackpool trains finish. The diesel service to Penrith will continue in the Winter t.t. as it is understood that B.R. have to establish with the T.U.C.C. that the line is uneconomic now there is no goods traffic, before the line can be wholly closed (except for the Kirkby Stephen-Appleby section). |
SLS/196009 |
28/02/1962 |
Bescot MPD |
In addition to 46442/56 ex 12F other 64XX class to arrive are *46428/48 from 8F and 46470 from the N.E.R. (*STOP PRESS-These two were transferred to Bushbury on 20th March.) |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46470 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2162 Allocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (21D) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (2L) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46470 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|