Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 46494 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2186
To Service During 12/1951 to Burton (17B)
Withdrawal Wed 12/09/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962
Service Life 10 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
17B Burton (New) m/e 12/1951
22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 27/02/1954
19B Sheffield Millhouses m/e 16/06/1956
31A Cambridge w/e 01/04/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn 12/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 17B Burton w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 16/06/1956
LOAN 41C Sheffield Millhouses 01/02/1958
ALLOC 41C Sheffield Millhouses 23/02/1958
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 5w/e 08/04/1961
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962
WDN   12/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 46494
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2186
Allocated to Burton (17B)
   
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
01/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Da SLS 5/1962 Link
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 46494    

prev prev