Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 858 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4718 Week
» 7300 Month
» 271933 Year
» 1493498 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 46505 on 21/11/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 21/11/1952 to Oswestry (89A)
Withdrawal During 06/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967
Service Life 14 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
89A Oswestry (New) 21/11/1952
1A Willesden w/e 30/03/1963
6A Chester (MR) w/e 25/05/1963
2E Saltley w/e 07/12/1963
2L Leamington w/e 24/10/1964
2E Saltley w/e 19/06/1965
9D Newton Heath w/e 06/08/1966
9L Buxton (LNWR) w/e 06/05/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 29/11/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1952
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 2E Saltley 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 2L Leamington 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 2E Saltley 4w/e 10/07/1965
LOAN 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 06/08/1966
LOAN 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 10/09/1966
ALLOC 9L Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 06/05/1967
WDN   w/e 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
04/12/1963 Saltley MPD Of the Fowler 2-6-4Ts, 42419 was condemned 4th December, 42417 is waiting works (?) leaving 42400/16/21 in traffic, although Drivers complain they have inadequate brake power on goods trains. 46505/26/9 have arrived, the latter two green; some Class 4Fs are to come out of store, probably for Bescot in lieu of LNW Super Ds. SLS/196401
16/01/1966 Crewe South MPD (ex Works) ex Works: 44971, 46505, 48400. Waiting Works: 48276. Also on Crewe S. shed 61158 (36A). SLS/196602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/11/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46505
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Oswestry (89A)
   
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L)    
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46505    

prev prev