Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 46512   16/12/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 16/12/1952 to Oswestry (89A)
Withdrawal During 12/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
89A Oswestry (New) 16/12/1952
6D Shrewsbury w/e 23/01/1965
1A Willesden w/e 06/02/1965
6D Shrewsbury w/e 26/06/1965
5E Nuneaton w/e 02/10/1965
5B Crewe South w/e 04/06/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 27/12/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1952
ALLOC 1A Willesden 3w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 11/06/1966
WDN   w/e 12/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 46512
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Oswestry (89A)
   
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
06/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 46512    

prev prev