Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1679 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19482 Week
» 72498 Month
» 192025 Year
» 3218878 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4263 |
m/e |
10/1919 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
213 |
Works Number |
2843 |
To Service |
During 10/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 14/02/1964 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86B |
Newport Pill |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
86J |
Aberdare |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
ALLOC |
86F |
Tondu |
m/e |
30/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
24/02/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1948 |
Caerphilly Works |
On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4263 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2843 |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (86J) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
14/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4263 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|