Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 796 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5397 Week
» 16944 Month
» 416626 Year
» 493213 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 42073   17/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 17/11/1950 to Stewarts Lane (73A)
Withdrawal During 10/1967
Service Life 16 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
73A Stewarts Lane (New) 17/11/1950
74A Ashford 4w/e 05/02/1951
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 06/10/1951
74A Ashford 6w/e 13/08/1952
52A Gateshead 5w/e 18/12/1954
56G Bradford Hammerton Street 5w/e 20/07/1957
56E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 21/09/1957
50A York (North) 5w/e 14/06/1958
50B Neville Hill 4w/e 11/10/1958
56F Low Moor w/e 31/01/1959
56A Wakefield w/e 14/11/1959
56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 01/10/1960
56B Ardsley w/e 12/09/1964
56F Low Moor 4w/e 30/01/1965
55E Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 73A Stewarts Lane 17/11/1950
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 74A Ashford 2w/e 13/08/1952
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 9w/e 31/10/1954
LOAN 52A Gateshead 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 56G Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 56E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
WDN   30/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/11/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 42073
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)
   
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (74A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
13/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (74A)    
18/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
01/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
30/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42073    

prev prev