Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 42085   27/02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 27/02/1951 to Brighton (75A)
Withdrawal During 10/1967
Service Life 16 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
75A Brighton (New) 27/02/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
52B Heaton 4w/e 22/03/1952
51A Darlington 4w/e 19/07/1952
50E Scarborough 5w/e 22/10/1955
50G Whitby 4w/e 18/02/1956
50E Scarborough 4w/e 25/05/1956
50G Whitby 5w/e 14/06/1958
50A York (North) w/e 11/04/1959
51A Darlington w/e 25/11/1961
55F Manningham 4w/e 09/10/1965
55E Normanton 4w/e 20/05/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75A Brighton 6w/e 14/03/1951
NEW 75A Brighton 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 50E Scarborough 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 50G Whitby 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 50E Scarborough 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 50G Whitby 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 55F Manningham 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 20/05/1967
WDN   30/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/02/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 42085
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Brighton (75A)
   
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (50E)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (50G)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (50E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (50G)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (55F)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42085    

prev prev