Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 711 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2826 Week
» 25332 Month
» 328522 Year
» 1550087 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2190 on 17/01/1948
British Railways 42190 w/e 06/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 17/01/1948
Withdrawal During 08/1964
Scrapping During 09/1964
Service Life 16 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 17/01/1948
33A Plaistow 4w/e 18/08/1951
67A Corkerhill 8w/e 19/04/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 30A Corkerhill w/e 17/01/1948
LOAN 33A Plaistow 3w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   on 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 40605, 40915, 1148, 2190, 4256, 57353, 57623, 17663. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/01/1948 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2190
Built at Derby Works
   
06/05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42190    
18/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42190    

prev prev