Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 816 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2931 Week
» 25437 Month
» 328627 Year
» 1550192 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2191 on 24/01/1948
British Railways 42191 w/e 28/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 24/01/1948
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 14 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 24/01/1948
33A Plaistow 5w/e 22/09/1951
67A Corkerhill 8w/e 19/04/1952
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 17/05/1952
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 09/04/1960
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 30A Corkerhill w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 33A Plaistow w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 09/04/1960
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 626, 40642, 40919, 1171, 2191, 42198, 42905, 4001, 54446, 17470, 57569, 57640. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/01/1948 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2191
Built at Derby Works
   
28/01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42191    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42191    

prev prev