Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 128 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4943 Week
» 11077 Month
» 238961 Year
» 1460526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2203 m/e 11/1945
BR 42203 w/e 17/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 11/1945
Withdrawal Fri 21/12/1962
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 17 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1945
27A Polmadie 01/01/1948
66B Motherwell 4w/e 25/11/1950
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 21/10/1961
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 18/11/1961
   Withdrawn 21/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 24D Lower Darwen m/e 30/11/1945
ALLOC 66B Motherwell m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 2w/e 21/10/1961
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 2w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 67F Stranraer 5w/e 13/10/1962
WDN   21/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1945 General On 15/11, 2792(15C) was noted minus coupling rods on a goods train hauled by 5031 (19E). Other November observations included 2200-6 all en route ex Derby. SLS/194601
31/01/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 1179, 42203, 2207, 42793, 42876, 42918, 4901, 44957/60, 4961/69, 44999, 45155/73/4/5/94, 45320/55, 45443/84, 45583, 14493, 15172, 55238, 56254, 16274, 16333/64/71, 17276, 57292, 57361, 57417, 17550/79, 17682. No. 45575 was turned out on 14/1 in the new green livery-the first locomotive to be painted here in colours since the war. The 'Great Western' effect was enhanced by the fact that it has a domeless boiler. The St. Rollox tradition of having numbering of a different size to other works is retained, the numbers being of the larger size, as on the black locomotives painted here. The front numberplate and shedplate were at one time painted red, but were blacked over before completion. Nos. 54507 an 55199 following No. 45575 from the Paint Shop, have both had the background of their numberplates painted red. Another of the few remaining 'Jubilee's' with domeless boilers-No. 45579-is also in the Works, The Works' shunter-No. 56025-has been the object of a commendable piece of enterprise. On completion of its overhaul it has been beautifully repainted with full lining-even the front of the cab being lined-with crests of the smaller type on the saddle tanks. SLS/195003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2203
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A)    
17/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42203    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
21/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42203    

prev prev