Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 833 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2948 Week
» 25454 Month
» 328644 Year
» 1550209 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2223 on 06/04/1946
British Railways 42223 w/e 19/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 06/04/1946
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Sat 18/08/1962
Service Life 16 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 06/04/1946
13D Northwich 4w/e 22/06/1946
13D Northwich on 01/01/1948
33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/12/1956
33C Shoeburyness 5w/e 15/11/1958
   Withdrawn on 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 13A Plaistow w/e 06/04/1946
ALLOC 33B Tilbury w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   on 18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/04/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2223
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (13D)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northwich (13D)    
19/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42223    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42223    

prev prev