Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 771 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2886 Week
» 25392 Month
» 328582 Year
» 1550147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2224 on 16/04/1946
British Railways 42224 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 16/04/1946
Withdrawal Sat 21/01/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 20 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 16/04/1946
13D Northwich 4w/e 22/06/1946
13D Northwich on 01/01/1948
33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/12/1956
33C Shoeburyness 5w/e 15/11/1958
5D Stoke w/e 23/06/1962
6A Chester (MR) w/e 26/06/1965
10C Fleetwood w/e 21/08/1965
10D Lostock Hall w/e 19/02/1966
   Withdrawn on 21/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 13A Plaistow w/e 20/04/1946
ALLOC 33B Tilbury w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 01/11/1958
REINS 91M To London Midland Region on 17/06/1962
WDN   on 18/06/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 10C Fleetwood 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 12/03/1966
WDN   w/e 21/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/04/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2224
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (13D)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northwich (13D)    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42224    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C)    
19/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
21/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42224    

prev prev