Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 535 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2650 Week
» 25156 Month
» 328346 Year
» 1549911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2225 on 24/04/1946
British Railways 42225 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 24/04/1946
Withdrawal Sat 18/06/1966
Scrapping During 10/1966
Service Life 20 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 24/04/1946
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
34E Neasden 5w/e 24/04/1954
21A Saltley w/e 09/12/1961
17C Rowsley w/e 22/09/1962
16C Derby w/e 02/05/1964
12E Tebay w/e 27/03/1965
   Withdrawn on 18/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 13A Plaistow w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 24/04/1954
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 16C Derby 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 12E Tebay 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 18/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1949 Crewe Works Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand.
Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox.
Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides.
Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three.
SLS/194903
31/12/1961 Saltley MPD 2-6-4Ts transferred here on connection with temporary steam trains on Leicester line are 42082, 42146, 42181, 42225/33. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/04/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2225
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42225    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
18/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42225    

prev prev