Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 471 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6225 Week
» 34183 Month
» 68825 Year
» 1290390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2226   02/05/1946
BR 42226 w/e 12/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 02/05/1946
Withdrawal Sat 27/06/1964
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 18 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33C Shoeburyness w/e 07/11/1959
5D Stoke w/e 23/06/1962
2J Aston w/e 14/12/1963
5D Stoke w/e 04/01/1964
   Withdrawn 27/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 07/05/1960
REINS 91M To London Midland Region 17/06/1962
WDN   18/06/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 27/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/05/1946 To Service To service as LMS Number 2226
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42226    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (2J)    
04/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
27/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42226    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev