Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 86 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7540 Week
» 10122 Month
» 274755 Year
» 1496320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2237 on 23/08/1946
BR 42237 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 23/08/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/12/1962
Scrapping During 01/1963
Service Life 16 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 23/08/1946
5D Stoke on 01/01/1948
14B Kentish Town 3w/e 11/12/1948
17C Rowsley w/e 07/07/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 08/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5D Stoke w/e 02/08/1947
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 23/08/1947
LOAN 14B Kentish Town w/e 11/12/1948
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 04/08/1962
WDN   w/e 08/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/08/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2237
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42237    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
08/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42237    

prev prev