Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 177 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 177 Week
» 14081 Month
» 322062 Year
» 1206443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2238   29/08/1946
BR 42238 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 29/08/1946
Withdrawal Sat 12/10/1963
Scrapping During 10/1963
Service Life 17 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27A Polmadie 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 22/01/1955
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 14/02/1959
6A Chester (MR) w/e 06/02/1960
12G Oxenholme w/e 18/06/1960
24L Carnforth w/e 16/06/1962
12C Carlisle Canal w/e 11/05/1963
24L Carnforth w/e 22/06/1963
   Withdrawn 12/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 22/01/1955
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 14/02/1959
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 12G Oxenholme 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 12C Carlisle Canal 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 12/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/08/1946 To Service To service as LMS Number 2238
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42238    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxenholme (12G)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
11/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
12/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42238    

prev prev