Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 528 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6282 Week
» 34240 Month
» 68882 Year
» 1290447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2248   16/10/1946
BR 42248 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 16/10/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/12/1962
Scrapping Mon 04/02/1963
Service Life 16 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34E Neasden 4w/e 19/03/1955
9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 05/08/1961
14D Neasden w/e 28/10/1961
9G Gorton w/e 18/11/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 15/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 19/10/1946
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 26/07/1947
ALLOC 13A Plaistow w/e 23/08/1947
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 26/03/1955
LOAN 14D Neasden 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 23/02/1958
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   w/e 15/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/10/1946 To Service To service as LMS Number 2248
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42248    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
28/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
15/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42248    

prev prev