Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 362 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 362 Week
» 30652 Month
» 333842 Year
» 1555407 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2249 on 18/10/1946
British Railways 42249 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 18/10/1946
Withdrawal Sat 16/07/1966
Scrapping During 11/1966
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 18/10/1946
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
34E Neasden 4w/e 19/03/1955
9G Gorton w/e 18/11/1961
9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 21/09/1963
9K Bolton w/e 28/11/1964
   Withdrawn on 16/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 19/10/1946
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 30/08/1947
ALLOC 13A Plaistow w/e 27/09/1947
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 26/03/1955
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN   w/e 16/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205
14/11/1965 Crewe Works (Main Erecting shop) Main Erecting shop: 42249, 44690, 44761, 45021/150, 48176/214/53/78/92, 48544, 48775, 70010/25/6/9/53. 92012, D181, D208/15/21/89/97, D311/32/82/98, D1518/32/42/50/7/60/7/84/97, D1980-9. Electric shop: E3014/45/7/51/86, 26002/8, 27002. New Diesel Repair Shop: D153, D1534/70/82, D1683, D1717/76, D1843/60. Test Area: D1536/72, D1976, D5705/14. Traverser Area: 45421, 48545, 70013, 26027, E3060, D376/7, D1516/23/8/68, D1646/89, D1715, D1849, D5244, D5716. Side of Works: 48744, 70047, 92117/228, E3052. Paint shop: D1974/5/7/8/9, 46235, D305/58, E3054/97, D5709. Outside paint shop: 44809, 48033, 92063 re-painted, D347, D1541, D1634, D1770, D5710. SLS/196512

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/10/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2249
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
29/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42249    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
16/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42249    

prev prev