Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 733 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2848 Week
» 25354 Month
» 328544 Year
» 1550109 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2251 on 30/10/1946
British Railways 42251 w/e 31/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 30/10/1946
Withdrawal During 10/1967
Scrapping During 04/1968
Service Life 20 yrs , 11 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 30/10/1946
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
34E Neasden 4w/e 22/01/1955
2F Woodford Halse w/e 30/06/1962
6H Bangor w/e 20/06/1964
6A Chester (MR) w/e 12/06/1965
10D Lostock Hall w/e 21/08/1965
12E Tebay w/e 18/06/1966
56F Low Moor w/e 29/04/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 02/11/1946
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 16/08/1947
ALLOC 13A Plaistow w/e 27/09/1947
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 29/01/1955
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 12E Tebay 4w/e 09/07/1966
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 06/05/1967
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 20/05/1967
WDN   on 30/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2251
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
31/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42251    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42251    

prev prev