Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 491 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6245 Week
» 34203 Month
» 68845 Year
» 1290410 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2254   13/11/1946
BR 42254 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 13/11/1946
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Sat 03/11/1962
Service Life 15 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 16/11/1946
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 20/09/1947
ALLOC 13A Plaistow w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1946 To Service To service as LMS Number 2254
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42254    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42254    

prev prev