Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 827 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2942 Week
» 25448 Month
» 328638 Year
» 1550203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2255 on 16/11/1946
British Railways 42255 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 16/11/1946
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Sat 03/11/1962
Service Life 15 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 16/11/1946
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 16/11/1946
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 04/10/1947
ALLOC 13A Plaistow w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/11/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2255
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42255    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42255    

prev prev