Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 890 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 3005 Week
» 25511 Month
» 328701 Year
» 1550266 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2257 on 27/11/1946
British Railways 42257 w/e 25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 27/11/1946
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Sat 08/09/1962
Service Life 15 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 27/11/1946
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 30/11/1946
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 04/10/1947
ALLOC 13A Plaistow w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop-MR 1000, 44579, 48390; Diesel Erecting Shop-12047/95, 13084/118/9/72, D3771, ED4; New Work-11 D/E sh. 0-6-0, D3782-92 new; Test House-D2, D3781, D5021; Diesel Finishing shop- D3/4, D5008/22/3; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay, 42415I, 42517/36G, 44122I, 44172G, 44214G, 44279/377I, 44389/402 G, 44468I, 44472G, 48053/346/77/463G; Also, 42395, 44166/191, 80091stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42393I, 44164I, 47453I, 75057I, 80144I, 73014stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P.-D5024-31new, 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P, D5-D8new; Yard-40047/680, 42257/308/27/54/400/624, 43210/386/982, 44092/139/154/169, 45250, 47309, 48335/392/418, 48715 frames, 58213, 10000/203/800, D5020, D5700/17, Cecil Rakes. SLS/195909
17/09/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop-44389/529/8346, D4, D3785, D5023; Diesel Erecting Shop-10201, 11126, 12038, 13091, New Work-9 D/E Sh. D3787-95new; Diesel Finishing Shop-D2/3/5, D5025; Test House-D5024; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay-42281 I, 42512 I, 42514 G, 42517 I. 42624 G. 44267 G, 44355 I, 44539 G, 47386 I, 47413 G, 47681 G, 48274/552 I, 48600 G, 48715 G, 80091 G. Stripping-44201, 47598, 48108/218stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42337/53 I, 43982 I. 44214/472 Casual, 80040 I; Stripping-47315stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-9 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo D5026-34new etc., 5 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 D6-10new; Yard-40047, 40332/680, 42257/314/54/422, 42537 frames, 42686, 43886/935, 44122/69/87/327/77/402/560, 44807, 47309, 48177/293/672/87, 58191, 75046, 10100/800, 12000/36/55, D3786, ED4, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2257
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
25/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42257    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42257    

prev prev