Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 490 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4126 Week
» 23771 Month
» 58413 Year
» 1279978 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2684 m/e 06/1945
BR 42684 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 06/1945
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Sat 08/09/1962
Service Life 17 yrs , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
14C St Albans 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
PLS Plaistow m/e 30/11/1949
91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 24/12/1949
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 20C Royston 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 14C St Albans w/e 03/01/1948
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 14/08/1948
EXLOAN 14C St Albans w/e 19/02/1949
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 26/02/1949
EXLOAN 14C St Albans 08/06/1949
LOAN 13A Plaistow 25/11/1949
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1945 To Service To service as LMS Number 2684
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Albans (14C)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42684    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (PLS)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42684    

prev prev