Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1429 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19232 Week
» 72248 Month
» 191775 Year
» 3218628 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D427 |
10/06/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50027 |
09/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Lion |
17/04/1978 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/06/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/06/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D427 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50027 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/04/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Lion' at Laira |
|
|
23/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50027 |
|
|
30/04/1992 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|