Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 587 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 587 Week
» 19913 Month
» 246674 Year
» 757776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D427 10/06/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50027 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Lion 17/04/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 10/06/1968
Withdrawn 23/07/1991
Withdrawal Reason Power unit
Time in Service 23 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys
Cut Up 30/04/1992
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) 10/06/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 09/03/1974
LA Laira w/e 06/04/1974
   Withdrawn 23/07/1991

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/06/1968 To Service To service as D427
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
05/01/1969 Sightings Crewe North depot: Stabled in depot RO 9/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50027    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
06/04/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
17/04/1978 Naming Named 'Lion' at Laira    
23/07/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 50027    

prev prev