Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 777 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6382 Week
» 17929 Month
» 417611 Year
» 494198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4277   04/1920

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1920
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Service Life 44 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 08/08/1953
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 23/04/1955
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 29/06/1963
86F Aberbeeg 6w/e 13/04/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 86F Aberbeeg 5w/e 30/03/1964
WDN   w/e 15/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev