Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2887 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16293 Week
» 69309 Month
» 188836 Year
» 3215689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4279 |
m/e |
05/1920 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
213 |
Works Number |
2859 |
To Service |
During 05/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 15/01/1964 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
ALLOC |
88J |
Aberdare |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
27/01/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/10/1961 |
Caerphilly Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. |
SLS/196112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4279 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2859 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
15/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4279 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|